Lacey v. Daniels et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

1:2013-cv-00263 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/06/2013
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Danny G Lacey.
1
https://ecf.alnd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01913144333" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01913144333','146746','8','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
2
02/06/2013
Memorandum of Law in Support of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Danny G Lacey.
3
02/07/2013
NOTICE regarding consent of a civil action to a Magistrate Judge.
02/11/2013
Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601041064. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
02/14/2013
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondents Appear and Show Cause in writing, within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Mr. Lacey should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 2/14/2013.
5
03/07/2013
First MOTION for Extension of Time by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
6
03/19/2013
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have until March 28, 2013 to show cause in writing why the relief requested by Mr. Daniels should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on March 19, 2013.
7
03/27/2013
Respondent's Answer RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
1
Exhibit Ex-A Criminal Appeals Decision
2
Exhibit Ex A-1 Certificate of Judgment CR-03-0719
3
Exhibit Ex-B Transcript
4
Exhibit Ex-B1 Criminal Appeals Decision CR 10-1131
5
Exhibit Ex B-2 Certificate of Judgment CR 10-1131
5 Attachments
8
10/21/2013
ORDER that the Petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/21/2013.
10/22/2013
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/12/2013
RESPONSE to re 8 Order Requiring Response by Petitioner Re: Summary Disposition filed by Danny G Lacey.
04/03/2014
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/06/2015
Notice of Inquiry by Danny G Lacey.
11
04/07/2015
RESPONSE to re 10 filed by Danny G Lacey.
12
02/22/2016
MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Danny G Lacey. Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/22/2016.
13
03/07/2016
Exceptions and Objections to the 12 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Danny G Lacey.
14
03/09/2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION ADOPTING and ACCEPTING 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/9/2016.
15
03/09/2016
FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER DISMISSING CASE in accordance with the accompanying 14 Memorandum Opinion and with Rule 58 of the FRCP. The 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED as time-barred. Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Rules Governing 2254 Proceedings, a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/9/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.