Lacey v. Daniels et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

1:2013-cv-00301 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/08/2013
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Danny G Lacey.
2
02/08/2013
Brief filed by Danny G Lacey.
02/21/2013
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601041314 (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/02/2013
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE w/i 21 days why relief requested by Mr. Lacey should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 7/2/13.
4
07/23/2013
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, Leeposey Daniels.
1
Exhibit Ex-A Court of Criminal Appeals Decision CR-03-0657
2
Exhibit Ex-A 1-Certificate of Judgment CR-03-0657
3
Exhibit Ex-B Transcript CC-00-99-61
4
Exhibit Ex-B 1 Court of Criminal Appeals Decision CR-10-1130
5
Exhibit Ex-B 2 Certificate of Judgment CR-10-1130
5 Attachments
5
07/25/2013
ORDER The Court deems the case ripe for summary disposition under Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases on the basis of the defenses asserted in the respondents answer. Mr. Lacey shall have twenty days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer in support of his petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 7/25/13. (SAC)
6
08/14/2013
REPLY to re 4, 5 Order to Show Cause referencing State of Alabama's Answer filed by Danny G Lacey.
10/22/2013
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2014
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/16/2016
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Respondents are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted. Within fourteen calendar days after Respondents respond to the instant order, Petitioner SHALL file any reply to the defenses asserted by Respondents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/16/16. (SAC)
8
03/01/2016
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, Leeposey Daniels.
9
03/15/2016
RESPONSE to re 8 filed by Danny G Lacey.
10
03/28/2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 3/28/16. (SAC)
11
03/28/2016
FINAL JUDGMENT In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith and Rule 58, Fed. R. Civ. P., it is ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus in this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 3/28/16. (SAC)
12
04/25/2016
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 11 Order Dismissing Case, 10 Memorandum Opinion by Danny G Lacey. Filing fee $ 505, ALND receipt#: B4601070741receipt number 1126-2610596. Modified on 4/26/2016.
1
Exhibit Document 10
2
Exhibit Document 11
2 Attachments
13
04/26/2016
Transmittal Sheet (SAC)
14
04/26/2016
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 12 Notice of Appeal. (SAC)
15
04/27/2016
USCA Case Number 16-11918-B for 12 Notice of Appeal. (SAC)
05/27/2016
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 12 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 16-11918-B. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (SAC) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/10/2017
ORDER of USCA as to 12 Notice of Appeal- Petitioner cannot show that reasonable jurists would debate the district court's denial of relief on his claims. His motion for a COA is therefore DENIED. (SAC)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.