Lake v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00089 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
51
06/01/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
52
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
53
07/19/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
54
07/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
55
09/12/2018
In Limine
56
09/12/2018
In Limine
57
09/12/2018
Memorandum
58
09/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
59
09/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/03/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
62
10/04/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
63
10/22/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
64
10/23/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
10/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
12/14/2018
Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.