Lamarcus J. Davis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01820 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 232 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/27/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Lamarcus J. Davis (Shinn, J.)
3
04/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Lamarcus J. Davis. (Shinn, J.)
4
04/27/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Lamarcus J. Davis. (Shinn, J.)
04/27/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01820-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22010558. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/04/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/03/2018.
6
04/28/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
04/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 04/29/2018.
8
04/30/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 4/30/2018.
9
05/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/02/2018.
10
05/24/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
11
05/31/2018
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Creditor AF Title Co., as assignee of RAC Asset Holdings, LLC dba American Financial, as assignee of American Financial, Inc.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
13
06/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor AF Title Co., as assignee of RAC Asset Holdings, LLC dba American Financial, as assignee of American Financial, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/03/2018.
06/06/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, James G Henderson, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 13450.00, Assets Exempt: $ 1863.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 42635.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 42635.00. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/20/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Michael Harrison to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #11; Motion to Assume or Reject Motor Vehicle Lease as to American Financial filed by Michael Harrison, Attorney for AF Title Co./RAC Asset Holdings, LLC dba American Financial - 2012 Ford Fusion
16
06/20/2018
Agreed Order Rejecting Lease (Related Doc # 11) Signed on 6/20/2018. AF Title Co., as assignee of RAC Asset Holdings, LLC dba American Financial as assignee of American Financial, Inc.
17
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 06/22/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.