Lane v. Benner et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00165 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
05/22/2018
Quash
40
05/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
41
05/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
42
06/04/2018
Protective Order
43
06/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
44
06/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
45
06/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
46
07/03/2018
Notice of Settlement
47
07/09/2018
Notice (Other)
48
07/19/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
49
08/01/2018
Order
50
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
51
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
52
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
53
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
54
09/20/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.