Lane v. United Road Services Midwest
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00230 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
16
06/01/2018
Witness List
17
06/27/2018
Stipulation
18
06/27/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
19
06/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
20
10/08/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
21
10/09/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
22
12/19/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
23
12/19/2018
Memorandum
24
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
25
02/10/2019
Amend/Correct
26
02/13/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
27
02/15/2019
Compel
02/25/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/26/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
30
02/27/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
31
03/01/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
32
03/04/2019
Summary Judgment
33
03/04/2019
Memorandum
34
03/04/2019
Declaration
35
03/04/2019
Declaration
36
03/05/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
37
03/11/2019
Notice of Appearance
38
03/14/2019
Continue
39
03/27/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
40
04/08/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
41
04/30/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
42
04/30/2019
Affidavit
43
04/30/2019
Leave to File Document
44
05/02/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File
45
05/14/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
46
05/14/2019
Declaration
47
05/20/2019
Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.