Lara Henry Baker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00024 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/26/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/26/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
01/27/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
01/28/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/28/2019
Notice of Deficiency of Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
01/28/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/28/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
01/28/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/29/2019
Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
10
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
02/11/2019
Generic Motion / Application
15
02/11/2019
Declaration
16
02/14/2019
Extend Time (SA)
17
02/14/2019
Generic Motion / Application
18
02/14/2019
Declaration
19
02/15/2019
Extend Time (SA)
20
02/15/2019
Schedules A-J
21
02/15/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
22
02/15/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
23
02/15/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/26/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
04/09/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
26
04/10/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
27
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.