Larry Frye
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80873 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
08/27/2018
Dismiss Debtor
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.