Larry Gene Armstrong
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01862 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 163 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/02/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Larry Gene Armstrong
3
05/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Larry Gene Armstrong.
4
05/02/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Larry Gene Armstrong.
05/02/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01862-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22025005. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
05/02/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/04/2018 at 01:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/03/2018.
6
05/02/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 5/2/2018.
7
05/03/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
05/03/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Larry Gene Armstrong Case Number 02-02429, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/26/2002, Standard Discharge on 08/19/2002; Case Number 91-08604, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/07/1991, Standard Discharge on 10/15/1996.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
05/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 05/04/2018.
9
05/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/05/2018.
10
06/04/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
11
06/04/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Andre' M Toffel, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 44500.00, Assets Exempt: $ 21218.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 55965.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 55965.00. Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/04/2018 at 01:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/03/2018.). (Toffel, Andre')

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.