Larry Joe Cosby and Shelley Leigh Cosby
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01432 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 180 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Larry Joe Cosby, Shelley Leigh Cosby
2
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.
4
04/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.
5
04/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.
6
04/03/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.
04/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01432-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21913589. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/12/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
8
04/03/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.
9
04/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/04/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Larry Joe Cosby and Shelley Leigh Cosby Case Number 03-05286, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/17/2003, Standard Discharge on 10/30/2003.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/05/2018.
11
04/06/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Quicken Loans Inc.
12
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
13
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
14
04/09/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
04/16/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Quicken Loans Inc. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.).
16
04/17/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 15 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Quicken Loans Inc.). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
18
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
19
05/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
21
06/04/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of Quicken Loans, Inc. in the amount of $115,273.88 Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby. (Shinn, J.)
22
06/04/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby.). (Shinn, J.)
23
06/04/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
06/04/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
25
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/06/2018.
26
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/06/2018.
27
06/12/2018
Trustee's Withdrawal Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.). (Ch13troffice, km)
28
06/19/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 15 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Quicken Loans Inc.). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/21/2018.
30
06/27/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 21 Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of Quicken Loans, Inc. in the amount of $115,273.88 Filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
31
06/29/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 2 Signed on 6/29/2018 (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Larry Joe Cosby, Joint Debtor Shelley Leigh Cosby).
32
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/01/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.