Larry M Sadler and Bobby S Sadler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82273 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
08/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors Continued
62
11/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
69
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
76
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
88
01/10/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
89
01/10/2019
Relief from Stay
01/10/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
01/10/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
91
01/10/2019
Final Hearing Set
93
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
97
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
98
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.