Larry McDuffie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-03808 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/05/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Larry McDuffie (Shinn, J.)
2
09/05/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie. (Shinn, J.)
4
09/05/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/11/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/09/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/05/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/11/2017.
5
09/05/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie. (Shinn, J.)
6
09/05/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie. (Shinn, J.)
09/05/2017
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie. (Shinn, J.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03808-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21122125. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/05/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie. (Shinn, J.)
8
09/06/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
09/06/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Larry McDuffie Case Number 96-03769, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/03/1996, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/14/1997.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 4 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/07/2017.
10
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
11
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
12
10/11/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 10/11/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
13
11/14/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
11/17/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
15
11/29/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 11/29/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Larry McDuffie).
16
12/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 12/01/2017.
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.