Larry R. Bullard and Jo Anne Bullard
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-00341 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/31/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Larry r. Bullard and jo Anne Bullard
57
08/10/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
58
10/01/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
59
02/20/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.