Larsen v. Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00221 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/26/2018
Complaint
2
09/26/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
09/26/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/26/2018
Unissued Summons
4
10/01/2018
Order
5
10/05/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
10/12/2018
Summons Returned Executed
7
10/12/2018
Scheduling Order
10/12/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
9
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
10
11/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
11
12/03/2018
Answer to Complaint
12
12/03/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
13
01/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
14
01/31/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
15
02/14/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.