Larsen v. Ethelhurst Foundation, Incorporated
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00176 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Complaint
2
07/30/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
07/30/2018
Unissued Summons
07/30/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/17/2018
Entry of Default
5
09/17/2018
Declaration
6
09/26/2018
Declaration
7
09/28/2018
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
8
10/08/2018
Default Judgment
9
10/08/2018
Declaration
10
10/15/2018
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
11
10/17/2018
Judgment - Default

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.