Last Frontier Air Ventures, Ltd.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00154 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
05/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/21/2018
Declaration
05/22/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
05/22/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Change of Address
05/23/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
05/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
doc
05/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
doc
05/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
14
06/05/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
06/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
16
06/15/2018
Monthly Operating Report
06/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/22/2018
Case Status Report
18
06/26/2018
Entry of Appearance
19
06/27/2018
Employ
20
06/27/2018
Certificate of Service
21
06/28/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
23
07/05/2018
Approve Stipulation (Not Rule 9019)
24
07/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
25
07/09/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
26
07/17/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
27
07/17/2018
Monthly Operating Report
28
07/18/2018
Certificate of Service
07/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
07/19/2018
Notice of Non-Appointment of Creditors Committee
30
07/26/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
31
07/27/2018
Entry of Appearance
08/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/01/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
33
08/13/2018
Monthly Operating Report
34
08/14/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
08/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
08/15/2018
Case Status Report
36
08/17/2018
Proceeding Memo
37
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
38
08/27/2018
Certificate of Service
39
08/31/2018
Approve Stipulation
40
09/23/2018
Monthly Operating Report
41
10/01/2018
Case Status Report
42
10/12/2018
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
43
10/12/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
44
10/15/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
10/15/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
10/15/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.