Latitia McGinnis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02046 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
06/15/2018
Schedules A-J
18
06/15/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
19
06/15/2018
Statement of Intent
20
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2
21
06/15/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
22
06/15/2018
Employee Income Records
06/16/2018
Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/16/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/05/2018
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (Chapter 7 No Asset Cases)
10/22/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.