Latoya Michelle Dawkins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02023 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
doc
05/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
doc
05/23/2018
Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities
doc
05/23/2018
Statement of Intent
doc
05/23/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
doc
05/23/2018
Schedules A-J
doc
05/23/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
doc
05/23/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury
doc
05/23/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/15)
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2
doc
05/23/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/25/2018
Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities
doc
05/25/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
32
06/16/2018
Reinstate Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.