Laura J Drake
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81263 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
07/09/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case
doc
01/05/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
48
01/15/2019
Limit Notice
54
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
61
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
03/01/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.