Laurel E. Warner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00152 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
05/21/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
05/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
05/24/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
15
06/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/23/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
17
08/23/2018
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
08/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
19
09/12/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
20
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
10/15/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/16/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
23
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
24
10/17/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
10/18/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
10/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/22/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.