Laureta v. Food Services of America, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00276 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/21/2018
Notice of Removal
2
11/21/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
11/21/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
12/03/2018
Notice of Service List
5
12/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
12/04/2018
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
7
12/04/2018
Jury Demand
8
12/11/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
9
12/11/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
10
12/19/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
01/08/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
12
01/11/2019
Scheduling Order
13
03/21/2019
Amend/Correct
14
03/21/2019
Memorandum
15
04/04/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
04/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/22/2019
Amended Answer to Complaint
18
04/22/2019
Unissued Summons
04/22/2019
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/09/2019
Affidavit of Service
20
05/13/2019
Answer to Third Party Complaint
21
05/17/2019
Notice of Appearance
22
05/17/2019
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
23
05/17/2019
Memorandum
24
05/17/2019
Notice of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.