Lawrence Anthony Quintal, Sr and Ruth Steed Quintal
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00373 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
99
07/11/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
100
07/20/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
101
07/25/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
102
10/29/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
103
11/13/2018
Report of Unclaimed Funds / Funds Less than 5 dollars
104
12/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
105
12/13/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
106
01/17/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
107
01/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.