Lawson v. Gregg et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cv-00151 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
105
06/29/2018
USCA Mandate
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
08/23/2018
Summary Judgment
109
08/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
110
09/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
111
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
112
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
113
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
114
10/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
115
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
10/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
118
10/16/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
119
10/16/2018
Affidavit
120
10/18/2018
Notice of Appearance
121
10/19/2018
Notice (Other)
122
10/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
123
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
124
03/01/2019
ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Defendants motion for summary judgment at Docket 108 is GRANTED as to Officer Dahlstrom. Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Officers Clementson, Doll, Gregg, and Youngblood. Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 10:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/01/2019.
125
03/11/2019
Notice of Appearance
03/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
04/05/2019
Trial Management Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.