Laxfoss v. Lang et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00055 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
09/11/2018
Summary Judgment
26
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
27
09/17/2018
Notice (Other)
28
09/19/2018
Declaration
29
10/12/2018
Response to Order
30
10/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
31
10/18/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
32
10/29/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.