League of Conservation Voters et al v. Trump et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00101 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
03/19/2018
ORDER: re Motions to Dismiss 12 ; 25 ; and 34. Within 14 days from the date of this order, the parties shall file a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/19/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
50
06/08/2018
Summary Judgment
06/11/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
06/08/2018
Memorandum
52
06/08/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
54
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
55
07/18/2018
Summary Judgment
56
07/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
57
08/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
58
08/02/2018
Summary Judgment
59
08/02/2018
Memorandum
60
08/02/2018
Summary Judgment
61
08/02/2018
Memorandum
62
09/14/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
63
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
64
10/09/2018
Errata
65
10/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
66
10/12/2018
Hearing
67
10/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
68
10/12/2018
Response in Support of Motion
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
10/23/2018
Notice of Appearance
71
10/23/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
10/24/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
10/26/2018
Hearing
10/29/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
01/18/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
77
02/13/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
78
02/28/2019
Errata
79
03/15/2019
Transcript
80
03/29/2019
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment at Docket 50 is GRANTED. Federal Defendants motion, APIs cross-motion, and Alaskas motion for summary judgment at Dockets 55, 58, and 60, respectively, are DENIED. Section 5 of Executive Order 13795 is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs additional request for injunctive relief is DENIED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/29/2019.
81
04/01/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.