Leatrice L. Varner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02097 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
07/20/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
40
12/11/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
42
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
12/19/2018
Withdrawal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.