Leclaire v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00275 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/21/2018
Complaint
2
11/21/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
11/21/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
4
11/27/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
12/10/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/02/2019
Unissued Summons
01/02/2019
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
01/15/2019
Unissued Summons
01/15/2019
Summons Reissued (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/30/2019
Notice of Appearance
9
03/06/2019
Order
10
05/08/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.