Lee v. Baumbach et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00238 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/22/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
31
05/24/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
32
06/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
33
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
34
08/30/2018
Errata
35
10/17/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
10/18/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
11/07/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
38
11/08/2018
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.