Leibold v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00209 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/17/2018
Notice of Removal
2
09/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
09/17/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
09/18/2018
Notice of Service List
5
09/20/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
6
09/24/2018
Order
7
10/05/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
10/11/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
11/08/2018
Proposed Pretrial Order
10
11/12/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
11
11/20/2018
Scheduling Order
12
12/18/2018
Witness List
13
03/19/2019
Partial Summary Judgment
14
03/19/2019
Memorandum
15
03/19/2019
Declaration
16
03/19/2019
Declaration
17
03/19/2019
Declaration
18
03/19/2019
Notice (Other)
19
04/08/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
20
04/11/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
21
05/17/2019
ORDER re 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. State Farm's motion for Summary Judgment at docket 13 is DENIED. However, to the extent State Farm moves for a bifurcated trial, it may renew such a request in the event Leibold seeks and is granted leave to amend her complaint to include a claim related to her UIM coverage. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/17/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.