Leif Christopher Lidin-Lamon
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00398 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
doc
05/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
105
06/20/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
06/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
02/20/2019
Hearing
107
02/27/2019
Proceeding Memo
108
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
109
03/26/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
03/26/2019
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.