Leitner v. Nighswonger
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00143 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/19/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
2
06/19/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
3
06/26/2018
Additional Related Document
6
07/20/2018
Additional Related Document
7
08/01/2018
Additional Related Document
8
08/10/2018
Additional Related Document
09/27/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/27/2018
Notice of Change of Address
10
10/02/2018
Order
11
10/03/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.