Leitner v. White
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00144 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/19/2018
Complaint
2
06/19/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/19/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
06/19/2018
Unissued Summons
5
06/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
8
07/24/2018
Additional Related Document
9
08/01/2018
Additional Related Document
10
08/10/2018
Additional Related Document
11
09/27/2018
Notice of Change of Address
10/12/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/27/2018
Additional Related Document
14
10/12/2018
Order
15
10/15/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.