Lemons v. Superior Protection Services inc
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2017-cv-00567 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 337 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/06/2017
ORIGINAL CLASS/COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Superior Protection Services Inc filed by William Lemons. (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT063536.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service.
1
Civil Cover Sheet)(mef
1 Attachment
2
09/12/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William Clifton "Clif" Alexander. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3116540. Filed by William Lemons
3
09/18/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Lemons. Superior Protection Services Inc served on 9/14/2017.
4
09/26/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Cross on behalf of Superior Protection Services Inc (Cross, J.)
5
09/26/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Superior Protection Services Inc (Cross, J.)
6
09/26/2017
ORDER granting 5 Superior's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Superior has up to and including 10/9/2017, in which to file its response to Mr. Lemon's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/26/2017.
7
09/27/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Cross on behalf of Superior Protection Services Inc (Cross, J.)
8
10/09/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Superior Protection Services Inc.(Cross, J.)
9
10/16/2017
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/15/2017; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/29/2017; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/1/2018 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/16/2017.
10
10/19/2017
ORDER granting 2 William Clifton "Clif" Alexander's motion for admission pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2017.
11
12/29/2017
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Superior Protection Services Inc (Cross, J.)
12
01/05/2018
ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. The parties have up to and including 1/12/2018 to file the Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/5/2018.
13
01/15/2018
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Superior Protection Services Inc.
14
03/07/2018
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/1/2018 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 7/18/2018; Motions due by 8/2/2018; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/10/2018; Status Report due by 8/2/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/07/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.