Leo Blas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00411 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
doc
05/22/2018
Clarify
05/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/04/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
doc
06/04/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
06/12/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
06/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
06/12/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
88
06/12/2018
Certificate of Service
89
06/12/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
90
06/12/2018
Relief from Stay
91
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/19/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
06/20/2018
Hearing
93
06/21/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
94
06/22/2018
Hearing
95
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
96
06/29/2018
Claims (SA)
97
06/29/2018
Claims (SA)
98
06/29/2018
Claims (SA)
99
06/29/2018
Claims (SA)
100
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
101
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
102
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
103
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
104
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
105
07/05/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
doc
07/05/2018
Claim Utility (spreads to claims register - image or no image - can set claim status)
106
07/05/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/05/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
07/06/2018
Clarify
108
07/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
109
07/06/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
110
07/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
111
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
112
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
113
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
114
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
115
07/17/2018
Stipulation
116
07/23/2018
Stipulation
117
07/24/2018
Witness List
118
07/25/2018
Witness List
119
07/26/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
120
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
121
08/06/2018
Witness List
122
08/07/2018
Seal Document (Rule 9018) (Used to Get Approval to File UnderSeal)
123
08/07/2018
Seal Document
08/07/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Confidential Document / Under Seal (Viewing Restricted) (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
08/15/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
08/16/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
126
08/30/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
08/31/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
127
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
128
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/11/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
09/12/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
136
09/13/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
137
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
138
09/17/2018
Generic Motion / Application
139
09/17/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
140
09/17/2018
Certificate of Service
141
09/18/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
09/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
143
09/19/2018
Generic Motion / Application
144
09/24/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
145
10/04/2018
Strike
10/04/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
147
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
148
10/05/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
149
10/05/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
150
10/09/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.