Leo Phillip Russo
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01744 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 171 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
1
04/23/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Leo Phillip Russo
2
04/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
4
04/23/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
5
04/23/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
04/23/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01744-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21991341. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/23/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
7
04/23/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
8
04/23/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo
9
04/23/2018
**INCORRECT AS TO JUDGE ASSIGNMENT** - Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/02/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018. Modified on 4/24/2018
10
04/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Leo Phillip Russo Case Number 14-01743, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/02/2014, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 04/16/2018; Case Number 13-05003, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/07/2013, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 04/15/2014.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/24/2018
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge Tamara O Mitchell added to case. Involvement of Judge D. Sims Crawford Terminated
12
04/24/2018
Amended (due to Judge Reassignment) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 7/30/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 7/12/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt) Modified on 4/24/2018 to edit text
13
04/24/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
15
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
16
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
17
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
18
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
19
05/17/2018
ORDER Granting Signed on 05/17/2018 RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
20
05/18/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/17/2018 10:43:28 AM ]. File Size [ 141 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:24 ]. (RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
21
05/18/2018
Withdrawal of Claims: 5 Filed by Creditor CCRSI.
22
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Order Granting). Notice Date 05/19/2018.
23
05/31/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors on 6/6/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
24
06/01/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
25
06/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 24 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/12/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
26
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/03/2018.
27
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 6/6/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
28
07/06/2018
Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
1 Attachment
29
07/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Leo Phillip Russo.).
30
07/12/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/12/2018 11:19:24 AM ]. File Size [ 105 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:17 ]. (RE: Doc #24; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
31
07/13/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/13/2018 (RE: related document(s) 12 Confirmation Hearing, 24 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/2/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
32
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/15/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.