Leon Johnson, Jr. and Yolanda Devon Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-01035 (alnb)

Order Granting Debtor's Motion To Distribute Funds. Further, Progressive Insurance Company shall remit the insurance proceeds directly to the Chapter 13 Standing Trustee. Further, upon receipt of these proceeds and after administrative expenses the Trustee is directed to pay the proceeds on claim number 10 and the remaining balance of the claim shall be allowed as a general unsecured claim. (Related Doc # [37]) Signed on 1/23/2018.

17-01035-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Leon Johnson, Jr. } Case No: 17-01035-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-2754 } Yolanda Devon Johnson } SSN: XXX-XX-4766 } DEBTOR(S). } ORDER This matter came before the Court on Thursday, January 18, 2018 09:30 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #37; Debtor's Motion to Distribute Funds Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Robert D. Reese, attorney for Leon Johnson Jr. (Debtor) Robert D. Reese, attorney for Yolanda Devon Johnson (Joint Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, Staff Attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the pleadings, the Motion is Granted to allow the Debtor to enter into a settlement with Progressive Insurance Company regarding the 2001 Lexus RX3-V6 which was totaled. Further, Progressive Insurance Company shall remit the insurance proceeds directly to the Chapter 13 Standing Trustee. Further, upon receipt of these proceeds and after administrative expenses the Trustee is directed to pay the proceeds on claim number 10 and the remaining balance of the claim shall be allowed as a general unsecured claim. Upon receipt of the proceeds Westlake Financial Services or PRA Receivables Management, LLC, as agent of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (current lien holder) shall release its lien and forward the Certificate of Title to Progressive Insurance Company. Dated: 01/23/2018 /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-01035-TOM13 Doc 43 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 09:21:26 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[42] Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-01035-TOM Leon Johnson, Jr. Chapter 13 Yolanda Devon Johnson Debtors CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: crobey Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: trc Total Noticed: 1 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. NO NOTICES MAILED. Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9295951 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcynotice@westlakefinancial.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:12 WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SRVS, 4751 WILSHIRE BLVD, LOS ANGELES CA 90010-3847 TOTAL: 1 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Leon Johnson, Jr. pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Leon Johnson, Jr. pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-01035-TOM13 Doc 44 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 2100 B (12/15) United States Bankruptcy Court NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Case No. 17-01035-TOM13 Chapter 13 In re: Debtor(s) (including Name and Address) Leon Johnson, Jr. Yolanda Devon Johnson 1509 Cherry Avenue 1509 Cherry Avenue Birmingham AL 35214 Birmingham AL 35214 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CLAIM OTHER THAN FOR SECURITY The Claim No(s). listed below was/were filed or deemed filed under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(a) in this case by the alleged transferor. As evidence of the transfer of that claim, the transferee filed a Transfer of Claim Other than for Security in the clerk's office of this court on 01/22/2018. Name and Address of Alleged Transferor(s): Name and Address of Transferee: Claim No. 10: WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SRVS, 4751 WILSHIRE BLVD, LOS ANGELES Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC CA 90010 PO Box 41067 Norfolk, VA 23541 -- DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO TRANSFER -- The alleged transferor(s) of the claim is hereby notified that objections must be filed with the court within twenty-one (21) days of the mailing of this notice. If no objection is timely received by the court, the transferee will be substituted as the original claimant without further order of the court. Date: 01/24/18 Joseph E. Bulgarella CLERK OF THE COURT Case 17-01035-TOM13 Doc 44 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 273 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/10/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Leon Johnson Jr., Yolanda Devon Johnson (Shinn, J.)
2
03/10/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
3
03/10/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson (Shinn, J.)
5
03/10/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/12/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/04/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/11/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 09/06/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 06/12/2017.
6
03/10/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
7
03/10/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
8
03/10/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
9
03/10/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
10
03/11/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
03/12/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
03/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 03/12/2017.
03/13/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Leon Johnson, Jr. and Yolanda Devon Johnson Case Number 99-01564, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/12/1999, Standard Discharge on 07/09/1999; Case Number 99-01564, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/12/1999; Case Number 09-05127, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/29/2009, Standard Discharge on 06/17/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/13/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson).
14
03/15/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
03/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson). Notice Date 03/15/2017.
16
03/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 03/15/2017.
17
04/13/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 4/12/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
18
04/18/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
19
04/18/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 5/4/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
04/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/20/2017.
21
04/24/2017
Objection to Claim # 2 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $14,462.31 Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson. (Shinn, J.)
22
04/25/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson). Hearing scheduled 6/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
23
04/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/27/2017.
24
05/04/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/4/2017 11:31:06 AM ]. File Size [ 327 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:55 ]. (RE: Doc #18; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case (Insufficient Notice Time)). (adiuser).
25
05/05/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
26
05/17/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 5/17/2017. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson, 5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
05/19/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 121.67 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/19/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01035-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (121.67) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20723592. Fee Amount 121.67 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
05/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 05/19/2017.
06/07/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 112.33 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01035-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (112.33) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20787546. Fee Amount 112.33 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
06/14/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #21; Debtor's Objection to Claim #2 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $14,462.31) Hearing scheduled 07/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
07/17/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 76.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01035-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (76.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20931195. Fee Amount 76.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
07/19/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson). Hearing scheduled 8/31/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
30
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
31
08/18/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 13 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
32
09/06/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 9/6/2017 (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson). Hearing scheduled 10/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
33
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
34
10/20/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/19/2017 10:11:05 AM ]. File Size [ 87 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:14 ]. (RE: Doc #21; Debtor's Objection to Claim #2 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $14,462.31). (adiuser).
35
10/24/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 2 - Objection is Withdrawn. Signed on 10/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 21 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson).
36
10/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 10/26/2017.
37
12/20/2017
Motion to Distribute Funds Filed by Debtor Leon Johnson Jr., Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson
39
12/20/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion to Distribute Funds filed by Debtor Leon Johnson, Joint Debtor Yolanda Devon Johnson). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
40
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
41
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 10:04:14 AM ]. File Size [ 265 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:44 ]. (RE: Doc #37; Debtor's Motion to Distribute Funds). (adiuser).
42
01/22/2018
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SRVS (Claim No. 10) To Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC.
01/22/2018
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-01035-TOM13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21631379. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 42) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/23/2018
Order Granting Debtor's Motion To Distribute Funds. Further, Progressive Insurance Company shall remit the insurance proceeds directly to the Chapter 13 Standing Trustee. Further, upon receipt of these proceeds and after administrative expenses the Trustee is directed to pay the proceeds on claim number 10 and the remaining balance of the claim shall be allowed as a general unsecured claim. (Related Doc # [37]) Signed on 1/23/2018.
44
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[42] Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.