Leon de Nunez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-cv-01411 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 440 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/09/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Howard D Olinsky on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
05/08/2017
COMPLAINT filed by Margarita Leon de Nunez. (Submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Civil Cover Sheet
1 Attachment
2
05/08/2017
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Margarita Leon de Nunez. (Submitted by Howard Olinsky)
3
05/08/2017
SUMMONS Submitted by Margarita Leon de Nunez. (Submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
4
05/08/2017
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-1411-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
Mag Consent Form
1 Attachment
5
05/08/2017
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
6
05/09/2017
SCHEDULING ORDER: Social Security Scheduling Order - see attached PDF for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 05/09/2017.
7
05/09/2017
ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 05/09/2017.
8
05/23/2017
Order that Margarita Leon De Nunez show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/19/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.
1
Instructions
2
Consent Form
2 Attachments
9
05/30/2017
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
10
06/01/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Margarita Leon De Nunez: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 5/30/2017.
11
07/08/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexis L. Toma appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
12
07/08/2017
Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
Consent Form
1 Attachment
13
07/17/2017
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
14
07/18/2017
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
15
07/31/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
16
07/31/2017
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: [15] Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records Part 1
9
Medical Records Part 2
10
Medical Records Part 3
11
Medical Records Part 4
11 Attachments
17
09/27/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Margarita Leon De Nunez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
18
09/28/2017
ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Opening Brief is due on or before October 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 09/28/2017.
19
10/27/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Margarita Leon De Nunez.
20
11/27/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
21
12/12/2017
REPLY by Plaintiff Margarita Leon De Nunez.
22
01/08/2018
ORDER: The final decision of the Commissioner is vacated and this matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 1/8/18.
23
01/08/2018
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 8, 2018, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order.
24
04/06/2018
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Margarita Leon De Nunez.
1
Attorney Affirmation
2
Exhibit A All Professional Time
3
Exhibit B Attorney Time
4
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
5
Exhibit D Expenses
6
Exhibit E Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
7
Memorandum in Support
8
Certificate of Service
9
Statment Pursuant to Local Rule 54.2 (D)
10
Text of Proposed Order
10 Attachments
25
05/07/2018
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. ยง 2412 (Doc. [24]), in the amount of Seven Thousand Seven Hundred Ninety- Four Dollars and Thirty-Six Cents ($7,794.36) to be awarded to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/07/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.