Leona Carol Morrison
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00141 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
doc
05/22/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
doc
05/22/2018
Schedules A-J
doc
05/22/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
doc
05/22/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
doc
05/22/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
05/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
14
06/15/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/30/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
08/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
08/15/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
20
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/10/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.