Lesley Noel Pierce
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00374 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/29/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/29/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/30/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
9
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/07/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
13
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
14
11/07/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
15
11/07/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
16
11/07/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
11/07/2018
Certificate of Service
18
11/07/2018
Affidavit of Service
11/08/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
20
12/12/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
21
12/12/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
22
12/13/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
23
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.