Leslie E Bowers
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00108 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
21
06/14/2018
Certificate of Service
22
06/14/2018
Relief from Stay
23
06/18/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
06/19/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/03/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
07/09/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
29
07/17/2018
Generic Motion / Application
30
07/17/2018
Hearing
31
07/17/2018
Certificate of Service
32
08/17/2018
Proceeding Memo
33
08/17/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/23/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
09/04/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.