Leslie Moore Anderson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00136 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
09/24/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
09/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
35
09/24/2018
Certificate of Service
36
10/08/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
10/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/22/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
38
12/11/2018
Relief from Stay

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.