Letitia Louise England
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81563 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/24/2018
Employee Income Records
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing
05/25/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/18/2018
Schedule J
27
07/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
28
07/18/2018
Certificate of Service
33
07/18/2018
Schedule C
52
09/19/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
53
09/19/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.