Levi v. Federal Housing Finance Agency et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00183 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
05/23/2018
Recusal
18
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
19
05/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
20
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
21
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
22
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
23
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
24
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
25
06/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
26
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
27
06/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
28
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
29
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
30
06/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
31
06/11/2018
Certificate of Service
32
06/15/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
33
06/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
34
07/05/2018
Notice (Other)
35
07/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
36
08/07/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
37
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
38
12/07/2018
Order
39
02/15/2019
Notice of Appeal
40
02/26/2019
USCA Case Number
41
02/26/2019
USCA Scheduling Order
42
02/26/2019
USCA Order
43
05/03/2019
USCA Order
05/14/2019
USCA Appeal Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.