Lewis v. Grensky et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00066 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
06/19/2018
Order
4
07/19/2018
Unissued Summons
07/20/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/23/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
6
07/23/2018
Declaration
7
07/23/2018
Dismiss
8
08/01/2018
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
08/23/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
09/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12
09/19/2018
Certificate of Service
13
10/10/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
14
10/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
15
11/08/2018
Notice of Appearance
16
11/13/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
17
11/13/2018
Judgment
18
11/27/2018
Attorney Fees
19
11/27/2018
Affidavit
20
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.