Lincoln G. Larson, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00295 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
09/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
09/18/2018
Notice Request
09/18/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/18/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
15
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/07/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
12/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
18
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.