Lind v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00061 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
06/19/2018
Witness List
16
06/19/2018
Witness List
17
08/22/2018
Summary Judgment
18
09/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
19
09/12/2018
Memorandum
20
09/12/2018
Declaration
21
09/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
22
09/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
23
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
24
09/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
10/02/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
10/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
27
10/11/2018
Order
28
10/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
10/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
30
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.