Linda W Mott
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01593 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/25/2018
Notes Public (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
44
02/13/2019
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (after confirmation)
45
02/13/2019
Notice and Order Modifying Payments
46
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.