Lionel L Queen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00309 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of No Objection
06/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Dismiss Case
54
06/05/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
55
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
06/18/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
58
11/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
11/28/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.