Lisa Deann Bearden
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00124 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/11/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Lisa DeAnn Bearden
3
01/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Lisa DeAnn Bearden.
4
01/11/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Lisa DeAnn Bearden.
01/11/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00124-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21595425. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/12/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2018.
01/12/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Lisa DeAnn Bearden Case Number 07-00506, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/02/2007.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/12/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
7
01/12/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 1/12/2018.
8
01/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/13/2018.
9
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
10
01/17/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
11
01/26/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay,Receipt Number 181.00, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agetn for Medallion Bank
1
Exhibit "A"
1 Attachment
12
01/26/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agetn for Medallion Bank (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay,Receipt Number 181.00, Fee Amount $181,).
01/26/2018
Payment of Fee for Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agetn for Medallion Bank (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay,Receipt Number 181.00, Fee Amount $181,). (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/26/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee for Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay(18-00124-DSC7) [misc,payrfs] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21651101. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
01/26/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agents for Medallion Bank (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agents for Medallion Bank). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
15
01/28/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
16
01/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 01/28/2018.
17
01/31/2018
Affidavit Filed by Creditor Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. as servicing agetn for Medallion Bank (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay,Receipt Number 181.00, Fee Amount $181,).
18
02/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, James G Henderson, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 35000.00, Assets Exempt: $ 1925.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 56818.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 56818.00.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.