Lockuk v. Commissioner, Department of Corrections
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00261 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/31/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
11/06/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/06/2018
Order to Show Cause
4
12/14/2018
Notice (Other)
5
01/07/2019
Order
6
01/14/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.